Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Banking and Insurance | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Now in Banking and Insurance | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Transportation; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | Filed |