Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | Filed |