Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0858 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024