Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0886 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024