Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 621
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 621
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Now in Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|