|
05/07/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-142
|
|
|
|
05/06/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/22/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|