Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Filed |