Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Filed |