Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Filed |