Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building --Not Considered | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Filed |