Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0958 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024