Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0962 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024