Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 885
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 885
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/13/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|