Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1004 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024