Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1012 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2024
Bill January 23, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024