Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/19/2023 | Filed |