Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1030 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024