Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|