|
03/15/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-8
|
|
|
|
03/15/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 83, NAYS 30
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 32 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|