Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | Filed |