Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/27/2023 | Filed |