Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1031
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 1031
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|