House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|