|
04/12/2024
|
Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 82, NAYS 29
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 28 NAYS 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|