LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S1120
Action History
FL
Florida Senate Bill S1120
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1120
Action History
Senate
03/08/2024
Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Senate
02/01/2024
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
Senate
01/24/2024
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed
Senate
01/09/2024
Introduced
Senate
01/08/2024
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules
Senate
12/28/2023
Filed