Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/16/24, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 12/28/2023 | Filed |