Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1136 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 2, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024