Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 2, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 19, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024