Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Filed |