Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | CS by Agriculture read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Referred to Agriculture; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Filed |