Senate | 03/04/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 463 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Substituted CS/HB 463 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Filed |