Senate | 03/05/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 1451 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Substituted HB 1451 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 5 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Filed |