Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1176 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 2, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024