Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1561
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 1561
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|