Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024