Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1210 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024