Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1220 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024