Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | Filed |