Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1567
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1567
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|