Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1181
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1181
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 12 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|