Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Filed |