Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1093
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 1093
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Banking and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|