Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Filed |