Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Filed |