House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (296000)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/24, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
CS by Agriculture read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Agriculture; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Agriculture; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|