Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1029
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1029
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Regulated Industries
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Regulated Industries; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|