Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1557
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1557
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|