Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 1109
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted HB 1109
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|