|
06/17/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-234
|
|
|
|
06/13/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 104, NAYS 9
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (828046)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|