Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1422 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024